IL SR1076 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-10)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-10)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Senate Task Force on Sexual Discrimination and Harassment Awareness and Prevention. Directs the Task Force to conduct a comprehensive review of the legal and social consequences of sexual discrimination and harassment, in both the public and private sectors, and to study and make recommendations on combating sexual discrimination and harassment in Illinois, including in workplaces, in educational institutions, and in state and local government. Provides for the composition of the Task Force, and for appointment of members (who shall serve without compensation) within 10 days after the adoption of this resolution. Requires the Task Force to hold its initial meeting no later than December 15, 2017, and to report its recommendations, including proposed legislation and administrative rule changes no later than December 31, 2018.
Title
SEXUAL HARASSMENT TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 7, 2017 |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |