IL SR0922 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 29, 2022 as College Savings Day in the State of Illinois to help raise awareness of the escalating costs of higher education and the importance of saving for college with the help of 529 College Savings Plans.
Title
COLLEGE SAVINGS DAY
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Be Adopted Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=922&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0922.htm |