IL SR0896 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses support for the Prairie Band Potawatomi Nation's efforts to regain possession of the Shab-eh-nay Reservation that was illegally sold by the federal government in 1849.
Title
SHAB-EH-NAY RESERVATION-FEDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=896&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0896.htm |