IL SR0896 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 2020 as "Illinois Whole Child Month". Urges parents, educators, and community members to support a whole child approach to education for each student. Urges every school in Illinois to celebrate Whole Child Month by adopting at least one of the whole child tenets to promote and encourage throughout the month.
Title
WHOLE CHILD MONTH
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 18, 2020 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 014-000-000 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=896&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0896.htm |