IL SR0726 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-25 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declare December 31, 2017 as "Richard "Dick" Lockhart Day" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RICHARD LOCKHART DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-25SenateResolution Adopted
2017-10-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-10-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2017-10-24SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2017-07-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-07-21SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback