IL SR0687 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares October 24, 2019 as World Polio Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
WORLD POLIO DAY
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 13, 2019 |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=687&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0687.htm |