IL SR0684 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the State Board of Elections to decline any request to turn over or share personal data or confidential voter registration data to the Advisory Commission on Election Integrity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VOTER INFORMATION - NO SHARING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-07-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-07-04SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-07-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-07-03SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-07-03SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback