IL SR0581 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares October 2021 as "Manufacturing Month" in the State of Illinois.
Title
MANUFACTURING MONTH
Sponsors
Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions October 28, 2021 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000 |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-10-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=581&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0581.htm |