IL SR0578 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the week of April 8-14, 2018 as Healthy Pet Week in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTHY PET WEEK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-09SenateResolution Adopted
2017-11-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions November 9, 2017
2017-11-08SenateBe Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
2017-11-08SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-11-08SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback