IL SR0546 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-06 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges Congress to reestablish the select committee on POW/MIA affairs to investigate issues relating to the process of recovering United States fallen service members.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POW/MIA - COMMITTEE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-12-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-11-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-11-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-11-07SenateResolution Adopted
2017-11-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2017-11-07SenateBe Adopted State Government; 005-000-000
2017-11-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-05-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback