IL SR0528 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Office of the Governor to work in collaboration with the Deaf and Hard of Hearing Commission to develop a report of recommendations to help ensure the Commission is better able to serve the deaf, hard of hearing, and DeafBlind community.
Title
DEAF/BLIND COMMISSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |