IL SR0523 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Disapproves Executive Order 2017-02 in its entirety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EO 2017-02 - DISAPPROVES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateBe Adopted Executive; 011-006-000
2017-05-16SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-05-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-16SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback