IL SR0488 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-28 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to raise awareness of its free online training in recognizing and reporting child abuse and neglect.
Title
DCFS ONLINE TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-28 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=488&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0488.htm |