IL SR0480 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Department of Health and Family Services to immediately suspend the Medicaid managed care RFP for a Purchase of Care Contract for review by the General Assembly to allow for transparency and assurance of non-discriminatory actions and fair competition for all sizes and business models of managed care organizations. Urges the General Assembly to convene the Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care to meet as soon as possible to review the RFP for a Purchase of Care Contract and seek answers from the Director of Healthcare and Family Services, the Procurement Policy Board, the Office of Inspector General, the Illinois Attorney General, and the individual in charge of the Medicaid managed care RFP for a Purchase of Care Contract.
Title
MEDICAID MANAGED CARE RFP
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Postponed - Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Postponed - Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=480&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0480.htm |