IL SR0429 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the creation of the Cahokia Mounds Mississippian Cultural National Historical Park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CAHOKIA MOUNDS NAT. PARK

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateResolution Adopted
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2019
2019-05-29SenateBe Adopted Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
2019-05-28SenateWaive Posting Notice
2019-05-21SenateAssigned to Environment and Conservation
2019-05-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-05-20SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback