IL SR0427 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May 4, 2017 as "Bluebird Project Day" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BLUEBIRD PROJECT DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateResolution Adopted
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateBe Adopted State Government; 007-000-000
2017-04-27SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback