IL SR0414 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-17 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates the date of May 17, 2017 as Illinois Epilepsy Advocacy Day in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL EPILEPSY ADVOCACY DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17SenateResolution Adopted
2017-05-17SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback