IL SR0412 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 11, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares November 18, 2017 as Wood Dale Park District Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WOOD DALE PARK DISTRICT DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 11, 2017
2017-05-10SenateBe Adopted Local Government; 008-000-000
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Local Government
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback