IL SR0408 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares April 28, 2017 as PURA Syndrome Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PURA SYNDROME DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenateResolution Adopted
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateBe Adopted Public Health; 005-000-000
2017-04-25SenateWaive Posting Notice
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-20SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback