IL SR0353 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the creation of an environmental justice agenda.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE AGENDA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateResolution Adopted
2017-05-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 12, 2017
2017-05-11SenateBe Adopted Energy and Public Utilities; 007-000-000
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-05-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2017-04-06SenateSponsor Removed Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-04-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2017-04-04SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2017-04-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback