IL SR0329 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of Medicaid MCOs.
Title
AUDIT-MEDICAID MCOS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=329&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0329.htm |