IL SR0322 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 24 to 28, 2017 as the inaugural, "Illinois Distracted Driving Awareness Week".
Title
DISTRACTED DRIVING WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Transportation; 012-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |