IL SR0317 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-31 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 037-018-001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-31 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 037-018-001
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Teachers' Retirement System and the State Universities Retirement System to pursue an Internal Revenue Service ruling on the compliance of Tier 2 with safe harbor provisions under Section 3121(b)(7)(F) of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.
Title
PENSION TIER 2 - IMPACT
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Biss [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Sen. Scott Bennett [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 37 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended 037-018-001 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Executive; 010-000-003 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |