IL SR0277 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares July 20, 2019 as Apollo 11 Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
APOLLO 11 DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=277&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0277.htm |