IL SR0269 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares March 27, 2019 as Elderly Women of Wisdom Day in Illinois to honor all women residing in skilled nursing facilities for their lifelong service to their families and communities.
Title
ELDERLY WOMEN OF WISDOM DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=269&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0269.htm |