IL SR0226 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares November 4, 2021 as Genetic Counselor Awareness Day in the State of Illinois.
Title
GENETIC COUNSELORS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Be Adopted Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=226&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0226.htm |