IL SR0183 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 2021 as Sikh Awareness and Appreciation Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
SIKH APPRECIATION MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=183&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0183.htm |