IL SR0140 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State of Illinois to implement both a "Buy America" policy and a "Buy Illinois" policy which would help the steel industry, create jobs, build the middle class, and protect American companies and workers.
Title
BUY AMERICAN/ILLINOIS STEEL
Sponsors
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Dale Fowler [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] |
Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Be Adopted Commerce; 010-000-000 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Postponed - Commerce |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=140&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0140.htm |