IL SR0131 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Condemns President Donald J. Trump's executive order barring refugees from the United States and calls on him to uphold and protect the values of all of the people of this great nation, which was founded by immigrants on principles that include religious freedom and the notion that all people are welcome and created equal.
Title
U.S. REFUGEE BAN - CONDEMNS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=131&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0131.htm |