IL SR0124 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the month of March 2023 as MS Awareness Month in the State of Illinois and recognizes the importance of finding the cause and cure of multiple sclerosis (MS). Encourages all Illinoisans to learn more about MS.
Title
MS AWARENESS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 22, 2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=124&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0124.htm |