IL SR0118 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 046-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 046-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State of Illinois to monitor and, where feasible, actively participate in all crumb rubber federal testing. Urges the State of Illinois to create a watchlist of fields and playgrounds, both indoors and outdoors that contain crumb rubber and publish them on the Illinois EPA website until the 2016 multi-agency federal testing concludes that crumb rubber is definitively safe for use as infill for artificial turf fields. Urges any indoor or outdoor facility that uses turf with crumb rubber infill used by children between the ages of 18-months to 12 years to provide proper notification to parents regarding 2016 multi-agency study of crumb rubber and the possible chemical exposure to their children due to playing on crumb rubber infill.
Title
CRUMB RUBBER DANGERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended 046-000-000 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |