IL SR0117 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates April 4, 2017 as Pay Equity Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PAY EQUITY DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateResolution Adopted
2017-03-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 9, 2017
2017-03-09SenateBe Adopted Labor; 015-000-000
2017-03-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Labor
2017-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2017-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback