IL SR0100 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-31 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress and the President of the United States to grant the right and privilege of United States residency to all farm, agricultural, and manufacturing workers who have served and labored during the COVID-19 crisis.
Title
ESSENTIAL WORKERS RESIDENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 4, 2021 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Be Adopted Executive; 009-006-000 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=100&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0100.htm |