IL SR0099 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares May 15, 2019 as Trauma-Informed Awareness Day in Illinois. Encourages all officers, agencies and employees of the State of Illinois whose responsibilities impact children and adults to become informed regarding the impacts of adverse childhood experiences, toxic stress and structural violence on children, adults and communities and to become aware of care practices, tools and interventions that promote healing and resiliency in children, adults and communities so that people, systems and community, family and interpersonal relationships can maximize their well-being.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRAUMA-INFORMED AWARENESS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-03-21SenateResolution Adopted
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2019
2019-03-05SenateBe Adopted Human Services; 009-000-000
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-07SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback