IL SR0094 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the date of May 8, 2021 as Alpha Kappa Alpha Day in the State of Illinois in honor of Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated, and its work.
Title
ALPHA KAPPA ALPHA DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 10, 2021 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |