IL SR0093 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Denounces any threats by Russia or any other foreign actors who seek to interfere with the sanctity of our democratic process. Urges that the Illinois State Board of Elections produce a final comprehensive report outlining the nature of breach, an audit of their IT systems, and that they enact preventative measures to ensure that such cyber interference never occurs again.
Title
ILL ELECTIONS - RUSSIA
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 007-000-000 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=93&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR0093.htm |