IL SR0063 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the General Assembly to continue to investigate and identify areas in which the State can improve with respect to the prevention of maternal mortality, especially among vulnerable populations.
Title
INVESTIGATE MATERNAL MORTALITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Public Health |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Public Health |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 010-002-000 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |