IL SR0059 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares the month of March 2019 as Social Work Month in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SOCIAL WORK MONTH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateBe Adopted Labor; 016-000-000
2019-03-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2019-02-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-02-06SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-02-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-05SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
2019-01-30SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-30SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback