IL SR0055 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct a performance audit of the Illinois Department of Veterans' Affairs and the Illinois Department of Public Health's management of the 2020 coronavirus outbreak at the LaSalle Veterans' Home.
Title
LASALLE VETERANS' HOME COVID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-21 | Senate | To Executive- Government Operations |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=55&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0055.htm |