IL SR0054 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares February 4, 2019 as "Rosa Parks Day" in the State of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ROSA PARKS DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-02-07SenateResolution Adopted
2019-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions
2019-02-07SenateBe Adopted State Government; 008-000-000
2019-01-30SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-01-29SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-29SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback