IL SR0011 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expresses support for Out of School Time programs in Illinois and recognizes that they serve as a key component to supporting violence prevention, academic achievement, social/emotional well-being, nutritional needs, and a strong workforce. Recognizes these programs' importance in a continuum of care for youth from birth to adulthood.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SUPPORT-OUT OF SCHOOL PROGRAMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-19SenateResolution Adopted
2023-03-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 30, 2023
2023-03-29SenateBe Adopted Early Childhood Education; 006-000-000
2023-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
2023-03-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
2023-03-07SenateAssigned to Early Childhood Education
2023-01-20SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-01-20SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback