IL SR0008 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the date that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority has to complete its review of the shared gang database to June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GANG DATABASE REVIEW-EXTEND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-02-07SenateResolution Adopted; 057-000-000
2019-01-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 5, 2019
2019-01-31SenateBe Adopted State Government; 006-000-000
2019-01-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-01-23SenateAssigned to State Government
2019-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback