IL SJRCA0049 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that, beginning in 2022, in each ten-year period, Senators shall be divided into two groups. Provides that Senators in the first group shall first be elected for terms of 6 years and then for terms of 4 years. Provides that Senators in the other group shall first be elected for terms of 4 years and then for terms of 6 years. Provides that, beginning in 2022, Representatives shall first be elected for terms of 4 years, then for terms of 2 years, and then for terms of 4 years. Provides that the General Assembly shall be a continuous body for a period beginning and ending at noon on the second Wednesday of January of consecutive odd-numbered years. Specifies that Representatives elected in 2012 shall serve two-year terms and that Representatives elected in 2014 and 2018 shall serve four-year terms. Specifies that Senators elected in 2014 shall serve two-year terms and that Senators elected in 2016 shall serve six-year terms. Effective upon being declared adopted. Applies to the election of General Assembly members in 2014 and thereafter; does not affect the terms of members elected before 2014.
Title
CON AMEND-LEGISLATURE TERMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-02-24 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ron Sandack |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=49&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SJRCA/09700SC0049.htm |