IL SJRCA0044 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Finance Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that no special fund in the State treasury shall be subject to sweeps, administrative charge-backs, or any other fiscal or budgetary maneuver that would in any way transfer any amounts from a special fund into any other fund of the State. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-FINANCE FUND SWEEPS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-02-24 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=44&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SJRCA/09700SC0044.htm |