IL SJRCA0024 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature Article of the Illinois Constitution. Limits a person's total service in the office of Speaker of the House of Representatives, President of the Senate, Minority Leader of the House, or Minority Leader of the Senate to a total of 10 years in any one office and 14 years combined in 2 or more offices. Effective upon being declared adopted and applies to service on or after the second Wednesday in January, 2013.
Title
CONAMEND- LEGISLATURE LIMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2011-04-06 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=24&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SJRCA/09700SC0024.htm |