IL SJRCA0016 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Suffrage and Elections Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides for the recall of all State Executive Branch officers, legislative leaders, the Auditor General, members of the General Assembly, and local government officials. Makes changes to the procedures for the recall of the Governor. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-RECALL OFFICIALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=16&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SJRCA/10200SC0016.htm |