IL SJRCA0016 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that certain taxes and fees levied for the Road Fund are private funds held in trust by the legislature, and are protected from fund sweeps. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-ROAD FUND LOCK BOX
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Forby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Postponed in Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=16&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SJRCA/09800SC0016.htm |