IL SJRCA0016 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that only marriage between a man and a woman is valid or recognized in Illinois. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-MARRIAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John O. Jones |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Shane Cultra |
2012-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine J. Johnson |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen |
2011-11-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
2011-10-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2011-10-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau |
2011-03-29 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=16&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SJRCA/09700SC0016.htm |