IL SJRCA0014 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Legislature, Local Government, and Revenue Articles of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that on the date of a general election through the term of the then-current General Assembly, no bill shall become law without the concurrence of at least two-thirds of the members elected to each house. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CONAMEND-2/3 VOTE LAME DUCK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Postponed in Executive Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christine Radogno |
2014-03-28 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Constitutional Amendments |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=14&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SJRCA/09800SC0014.htm |