IL SJRCA0012 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 31 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes to amend the Bill of Rights Article of the Illinois Constitution. Provides that the right of a parent to determine his or her child's education and healthcare shall not be infringed prior to the child's attainment of the age of majority, except where the child is in the care and custody of the State. Effective upon being declared adopted.
Title
CON AMEND-PARENTAL RIGHTS
Sponsors
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] |
Sen. Brian Stewart [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Win Stoller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-01-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-09-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=12&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SJRCA&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SJRCA/10200SC0012.htm |